HI HB451 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1241) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes an appropriation for the operational expenses and staffing costs of the Hawaii Association of Conservation Districts. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Hawaii Association Of Conservation Districts.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1241) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Nishihara, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:20PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to WTL, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 45).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 859), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-20HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Todd.
2019-02-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from WLH/EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 597) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-02-06HouseThe committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Lowen, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Thielen.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WLH/EEP on Wednesday, 02-06-19 10:30AM in House conference room 325.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to WLH/EEP, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback