HI HB450 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB450
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD hdraft with Representative(s) LoPresti, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD hdraft with Representative(s) LoPresti, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defines and recognizes rights in trust for children within the Child Protective Act. Requires family court to appoint guardian ad litem in custody cases. Provides that when a child is subject to harm or imminent harm, has been harmed, or may suffer probable harm is sufficient for police officer to take child into protective custody without court order, for department of human services to assume temporary foster custody of child, and for the department of human services to conduct an investigation.
Title
Relating To Child Welfare.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-19 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD {hdraft} with Representative(s) LoPresti, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB450 (Carry Over) 2021-02-19 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD hdraft with Representative(s) LoPresti, McDermott, Okimoto, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
SB822 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
SB822 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Subjects
Child Protective Act
Child Welfare
Department of Human Services
Imminent Harm
Probable Harm
Protective Custody
Rights in Trust
Child Welfare
Department of Human Services
Imminent Harm
Probable Harm
Protective Custody
Rights in Trust
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=450&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB450_.HTM |