HI HB450 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB450
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires UH to conduct a study on the effects of sunscreen on Hawaii's coral reefs and report to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Coral.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-28 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 329. |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-28-17 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-27 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-27-17 at 4:30 PM in Conference Room 329. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-20 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-21-17 1:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Gabbard, K. Rhoads, Riviere Co-Chairs. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: McKelvey, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 566) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1529) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Reported from HRE/AEN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1122) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Inouye, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Espero, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/AEN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-17 1:50PM in conference room 414. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to HRE/AEN/WTL, WAM. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 92). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 927), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Gates, Tupola. |
2017-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-28-17 3:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 485) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Creagan, Har, Ing, Ohno, Onishi, Takumi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-14-17 2:03PM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB450 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-28-17 at 4:30PM in Conference Room 329.