HI HB448 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB448
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the improper use of unmanned aircraft systems to the criminal offenses of violation of privacy in the first degree and violation of privacy in the second degree.
Title
Relating To Violation Of Privacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-02-04 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB680 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB448 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB448 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=448&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB448_.HTM |