HI HB439 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB439

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
Pending: Senate Labor and Technology Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes and appropriates funds for an immigrant services and access unit within the office of community services. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Immigrant Services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-09SenateReferred to LBT, WAM.
2023-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 159).
2023-03-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2023-03-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 956), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2023-02-24HouseThe committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garrett.
2023-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-24-23 11:30AM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa excused (1).
2023-02-14HouseReported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 345) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2023-01-31HouseThe committee on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Belatti, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Takenouchi, Nishimoto, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Amato.
2023-01-27HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Tuesday, 01-31-23 9:30AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-25HouseReferred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1
2023-01-23HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-20HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB439 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to LBT, WAM.
SB812 (Same As) 2023-02-15 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback