HI HB438 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB438
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires candidate names to be randomized on individual ballots and randomly rotated across precincts. (HB438 HD1)
Title
Relating To Arrangement Of Candidate Names On Ballots.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2). |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 461) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-08 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Thielen. |
2019-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19. |
2019-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-06-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-06-19. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-05-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB438 (Carry Over) 2019-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
SB194 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB194 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.