HI HB426 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB426
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires UH and the community colleges under certain circumstances to waive tuition for dependent children of service-connected one hundred per cent disability veterans, active or reserve members of the armed forces who were killed in action, and purple heart medal recipients awarded in 2001 or later. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Tuition Waivers.
Sponsors
Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] | Rep. Val Okimoto [R] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-16 - House - House Higher Education & Technology: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to HRE/PSM, WAM. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 102). |
2022-03-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Branco, Hashimoto, Holt, LoPresti, Marten, Onishi, Tokioka voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Nakashima excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 908-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marten, Perruso; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-28-22 12:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 578-22), recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-16 | House | The committees on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Clark, Belatti, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Kapela, Ohno, Quinlan, Woodson, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 02-16-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HET with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 205-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HET. |
2022-02-09 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, Branco, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, Tarnas; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 02-09-22 10:00AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CMV, HET, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB951 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB426 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CMV, HET, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB426 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CMV, HET, FIN, referral sheet 1