HI HB422 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Act 026, 04/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Act 026, 04/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes contracts entered by the Hawaii Tourism Authority for the marketing of all uses of the Hawaii Convention Center to be issued separately from the management, use, operation, or maintenance of the facility.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Tourism Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Val Okimoto [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Act 026, 04/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127). |
2019-04-26 | House | Act 026, on 04/25/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1127). |
2019-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2019-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 689). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1982) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Harimoto, K. Kahele. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-19 10:25AM in conference room 211. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1259) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Inouye, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to EET, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 41). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 820), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Gates, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Hashimoto, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, McDermott. |
2019-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-20-19 4:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5). |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 352), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=422&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB422_.HTM |