HI HB421 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a five-year general excise tax exemption starting January 1, 2020, for amounts received from the servicing and maintenance of helicopters in an aircraft service and maintenance facility or from the construction of a facility that services and maintains helicopters; provided that 75% of the helicopters serviced and maintained annually in the facility are equipped with quiet technology. Sunsets 12/31/2024. (HB421 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The General Excise Tax.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateThe committee on TRS deferred the measure.
2019-03-08SenateThe committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-19 1:00PM in conference room 225.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to TRS, WAM.
2019-03-01SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-01SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 40).
2019-02-28HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Har, Okimoto, Perruso, San Buenaventura, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-02-28HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 830), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Nakamura; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Matayoshi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 559) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-02-13HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Johanson, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Quinlan.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-13-19 10:10AM in House conference room 309.
2019-02-06HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-06HouseReported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 63) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB.
2019-02-01HouseThe committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2019-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Friday, 02-01-19 10:00AM in House conference room 423.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to TRN, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback