HI HB415 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB415
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the period during which a victim of child sexual abuse may bring an otherwise time-barred civil action against the victim's abuser or an entity with a duty of care. (HB415 HD1)
Title
Relating To Limitation Of Actions For Sexual Assault.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 254). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 799) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro, McDermott; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB415 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to JDL.