HI HB414 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Referred to HRE/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Extends for two additional years, the sunset date of Act 42, SLH 2018, which restores authority to the UH President to act as UH's Chief Procurement Officer for all procurement contracts under Chapter 103D, HRS. (HB414 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Procurement For The University Of Hawaii.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateReferred to HRE/GVO, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 174).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 985), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-22HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Todd, McDermott.
2019-02-20HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-22-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-14HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Nakamura excused (2).
2019-02-14HouseReported from LAB/LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 389) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-12HouseThe committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Kitagawa, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, McKelvey.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LAB/LHE on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to LAB/LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback