HI HB414 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:15pm in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 9 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-26 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:15pm in Conference Room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Waipio Valley Advisory Commission to advise the Department of Land and Natural Resources on the development of a long-term plan for ensuring the proper stewardship, preservation, and maintenance of Waipio Valley. Appropriates funds for the design and construction of flood damage reduction and stream stabilization in Waipio Valley. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
Waipio Valley Advisory Commission; Flood Mitigation; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 5:15pm in Conference Room 224. |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-26-13 at 4:35PM in Conference Room 224. |
2013-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday 04-26-13 1:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-13 1:00PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-13 1:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-19 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-22-13 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-18 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 709). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Kouchi discharged as conferee(s); Added as Co-Chair(s). |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senator(s) Ige discharged as (Co-) Chair; Added as conferee. |
2013-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Friday, 04-19-13 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Solomon, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Dela Cruz, Kouchi, Slom. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Evans, Lowen Co-Chairs; Hanohano, Cheape. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2013-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2013-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 491) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1266) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Kouchi. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-13 9:05AM in conference room 211. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1022) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Dela Cruz, Ihara, L. Thielen, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Ruderman. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-13 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 215). |
2013-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Coffman voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-03-01 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 890) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-27-13 11:00AM in conference room 308. |
2013-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2013-01-31 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). |
2013-01-31 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2013-01-28 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Coffman; and Excused: none. |
2013-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Monday, 01-28-13 9:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |