HI HB413 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB413
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to article V, section 2, of the Hawaii State Constitution to require that each gubernatorial nominee appoint a person from the same political party as a running mate for lieutenant governor in the general election.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To Article V, Section 2, Of The Hawaii State Constitution To Require The Gubernatorial Nominee Of Each Political Party To Select The Party's Lieutenant Governor Nominee.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Jackson Sayama [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB413 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB1356 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to JDC.
SB1356 (Same As) 2021-02-01 - Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=413&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB413_.HTM |