HI HB413 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Education Innovation Grants Program to support school-level innovation. Authorizes the Board of Education to adopt guiding principles and measures of success for the Grants Program and the Department of Education to implement the Grants Program. Establishes the Education Innovation Grants Special Fund. Makes appropriations. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education Innovation Grants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1486) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-07SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 375).
2019-03-05HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-05-19.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1215) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd.
2019-02-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 649) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:35PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback