HI HB409 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB409
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-03 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to contract with a nonprofit animal rescue group to oversee caretakers of feral cats and mongooses. Exempts registered caretakers of feral cats and mongooses from state laws and county ordinances relating to the feeding and confinement of cats and mongooses. Establishes a trap-sterilize-return process.
Title
Relating To Animal Caretakers.
Sponsors
Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Jackson Sayama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-03 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-03-21 10:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB409 (Carry Over) 2021-02-03 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=409&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB409_.HTM |