HI HB409 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Defines, for the purpose of compulsory education, a private school to be an education institution that teaches kindergarten through grade twelve and that is licensed or accredited by the Hawaii Association of Independent Schools or the Western Association of Schools and Colleges.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-12HouseThe committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 02-12-19 2:15PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to LHE, CPC, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB980 (Same As) 2019-07-09 - Act 227, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1329).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback