HI HB407 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Vetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1373).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires board of education approval prior to the termination of a complex area superintendent. (HB407 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-09SenateVetoed on 07-09-19 - Returned from the Governor without approval (Gov. Msg. No. 1373).
2019-07-09HouseVetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1373).
2019-06-24SenateNotice of Intent to veto dated 06-24-19 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-06-24HouseNotice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1202)
2019-05-01HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Kim . 5 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara, Moriwaki, Riviere, L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Eli, Onishi, Perruso voting no (3) and none excused (0).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 48).
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 48) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-23SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella.
2019-04-23HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Nishimoto, Hashimoto, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-22SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-19 3:30PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-18SenateConference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-19 1:15PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-17HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 909).
2019-04-17SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-17SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-15SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 808).
2019-04-15HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Hashimoto, Ohno, Tarnas, Okimoto.
2019-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 804).
2019-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2019-04-09HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 729) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-04-09SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 22; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella, Riviere, Ruderman. Noes, 3 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Ihara, Moriwaki). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2019-04-05SenateOne Day Notice 04-09-19.
2019-04-05SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1981) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-04-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Riviere, Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Harimoto; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) English, Inouye.
2019-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-05-19 10:15AM in conference room 211.
2019-03-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-03-22SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1485) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-03-20SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Fevella.
2019-03-15SenateThe committee(s) on EDU deferred the measure until 03-20-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-12SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-19 2:45PM in conference room 229.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to EDU, WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 173).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1095), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 12:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Perruso voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 730) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, Johanson, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2019-02-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 02-14-19 2:35PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback