HI HB401 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-12 - Referred to JDL, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that all applicants for a new or renewed driver's license, provisional license, instructional permit, or civil identification card must either clearly decline to register to vote or fill out the voter affidavit on their application before their application can be processed. (HB401 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Automatic Voter Registration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-12SenateReferred to JDL, WAM.
2015-03-12SenatePassed First Reading.
2015-03-12SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 181).
2015-03-10HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2015-03-06HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-10-15.
2015-03-06HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 817) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2015-02-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2015-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-27-15 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2015-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro excused (1).
2015-02-17HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 240) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2015-02-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, McDermott.
2015-01-30HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-03-15 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2015-01-26HouseReferred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1
2015-01-26HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2015-01-23HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback