HI HB399 | 2013 | Regular Session


Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-24 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]


Requires certain private employers to allow employees to take paid leaves of absence for organ, bone marrow, or peripheral blood stem cell donation. Requires employers to restore an employee returning from leave to the same or equivalent position. Establishes a private right of action for employees seeking enforcement of provisions. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Employment; Leave of Absence; Organ, Bone Marrow, or Peripheral Blood Stem Cell Donation



2013-04-24SenateThe conference committee deferred the measure.
2013-04-23HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-24-13 1:15PM in conference room 329.
2013-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-16SenateSenate Conferees appointed: Green, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Nishihara.
2013-04-16SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 697).
2013-04-15HouseHouse conferees appointed: Takumi, Belatti, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Ohno, Fukumoto.
2013-04-15HouseRe-referred to EDN, HLT, LAB, referral sheet 53
2013-04-12SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 650).
2013-04-11HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2013-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 599) in amended form (SD 2).
2013-04-11SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ige, Ihara, L. Thielen . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2013-04-09Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-13.
2013-04-09SenateFloor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2).
2013-04-09SenateFloor Amendment No. 12 offered.
2013-04-05Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-13.
2013-04-05SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2013-04-05SenateReported from HTH/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-04-03SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom; and 0 Excused: none.
2013-03-28SenateThe committee(s) on HTH/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-13 1:30PM in conference room 229.
2013-03-27SenateRe-Referred to HTH/JDL.
2013-03-08SenateRe-Referred to HTH/EDU, WAM.
2013-03-07SenateReferred to HTH/EDU.
2013-03-07SenatePassed First Reading.
2013-03-07SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 212).
2013-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, Har, Hashem, Ito, McDermott voting no (5) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2013-03-01HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fale, McDermott voting no (2) and Representative(s) Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5).
2013-02-28HouseDeferred one day Friday, 03-01-13.
2013-02-28HouseReported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 707) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2013-02-13HouseThe committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Aquino, Choy, Nakashima, Takai, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, Ichiyama.
2013-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 02-13-13 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2013-01-22HouseReferred to EDN, referral sheet 3
2013-01-22HouseIntroduced and Passed First Reading
2013-01-18HousePending introduction.

Hawaii State Sources

Bill Comments