HI HB397 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB397
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Transfers the administrative attachment of the Hawaii correctional system oversight commission from the department of the attorney general to the department of human services.
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Correctional System Oversight Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB397 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CMV, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB1223 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
HB1223 (Same As) 2021-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=397&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB397_.HTM |