HI HB395 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB395
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Corrections, Military, & Veterans Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State to pay, without delay, military personnel called to active duty at the same rate as their active duty counterparts; provide basic housing allowance; provide service credit for time on active duty; and allow state and county employees to count the time called to active duty in the State toward retirement.
Title
Relating To Active Duty Military Entitlements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CMV, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB458 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB395 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CMV, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB395 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CMV, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Active Duty Military Pay
Basic Allowance for Housing
Department of Defense
Service Credit
State Activation
Basic Allowance for Housing
Department of Defense
Service Credit
State Activation
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=395&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB395_.HTM |