HI HB393 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 1:30PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 1:30PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a procedure that allows certain DUI offenders whose privilege to drive was suspended or revoked prior to the effective date of the ignition interlock law to obtain an ignition interlock permit or permit to drive their employers' vehicles, subject to restrictions and limitations. Amends the driver's license revocation provision to require a maximum license revocation period of up to ten years upon conviction of a driver for manslaughter involving the operation of a vehicle. Gives discretion to the courts to revoke the license of any driver for up to five years upon a conviction of a driver of negligent homicide in the first degree or negligent homicide in the second degree. Allows up to two years of imprisonment when a convicted defendant is sentenced to probation for manslaughter. Clarifies that probation is an applicable sentence for manslaughter. Effective July 1, 2051. (SD2)
Title
Judicial Sentencing; Penal Code; Manslaughter; Negligent Homicide
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Joseph Souki [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-28-11 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-25-11 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-20-11 1:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 651). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 644). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: English, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Slom. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Har. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 584). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) House conferees appointed: Souki, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Ichiyama, Ito, Saiki, Thielen. | |
2011-04-15 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 573). | |
2011-04-14 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 459) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-04-12 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1260) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-04-08 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Slom. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL deferred the measure until 04-08-11 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL will hold a public decision making on 04-06-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-03-24 | (S) Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 881) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-03-21 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TIA were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) English, Espero, Dela Cruz, Gabbard, Kahele, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-03-15 | (S) The committee(s) on TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-21-11 1:18PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to TIA, JDL. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 98). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Rhoads voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 811) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-01 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Ito, Luke, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto, Thielen; Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Representative(s) Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey, Morita. | |
2011-02-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-01-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2011-02-15 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 267) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-09 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-04 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-09-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |