HI HB385 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes nonsupervisory legislative employees to unionize through the card check and expedited bargaining process and specifically includes the Office of the Auditor, Legislative Reference Bureau, Ethics Commission, and Office of the Ombudsman. Effective July 1, 2011. (HB385 HD1)
Title
Legislative Employees; Unionization
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LMG with Representative(s) Fontaine, Thielen voting no (2) and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Hashem excused (2). | |
2011-02-11 | (H) Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 229) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LMG. | |
2011-01-28 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Aquino, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Yamashita, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Johanson; 4 Noes: Representative(s) Luke, Saiki, Souki, Fontaine; and Excused: none. | |
2011-01-25 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Friday, 01-28-11 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to LAB, LMG, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |