HI HB382 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-29 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires the Auditor to conduct a management and program audit of the Department of Education's policies relating to bullying and cyberbullying, especially as they apply to students who are members of certain minority groups.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Department Of Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-29HouseThe committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-01-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Tuesday, 01-29-19 2:00PM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to LHE, LMG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB1011 (Same As) 2019-02-11 - The committee on GVO deferred the measure.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback