HI HB380 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB380
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the liquor commission to record all complaints against any licensee, regardless of whether the complaint is filed during or after the occurrence of the violation. Requires the liquor commission to review the history of complaints against any applicant at the time of application for a new license or renewal of an existing license.
Title
Relating To Intoxicating Liquor.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB298 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB380 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB380 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=380&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB380_.HTM |