HI HB379 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Department of Education to develop and coordinate mental health training to be offered annually to complex area superintendents, registered school nurses, and school health aides. Includes autism and fetal alcohol spectrum disorder training. (HB379 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LHE with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakamura, Thielen excused (2).
2019-02-07HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 147) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LHE.
2019-01-31HouseThe committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to HLT, LHE, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback