HI HB378 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB378

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-21 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 830).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes a Substance Use Disorder Services Clinic Working Group to develop recommendations to balance the needs of persons receiving treatment for substance use disorders with the needs of public safety. Requires a report to the Legislature. Effective 6/30/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Controlled Substances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-21SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 830).
2023-04-20HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Nakashima Co-Chairs; Hussey-Burdick, Ilagan, Pierick.
2023-04-14SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800).
2023-04-13HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2023-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 739) in amended form (SD 2).
2023-04-11SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House.
2023-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23.
2023-04-06SenateReported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1814) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2023-04-06SenateThe committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, Richards; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) McKelvey, Awa.
2023-03-31SenateThe committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 04-06-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference.
2023-03-16SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN.
2023-03-16SenateReported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1141) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN.
2023-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-03-10SenateThe committee(s) on HHS has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference.
2023-03-10SenateReferred to HHS, CPN.
2023-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 285).
2023-03-07HousePassed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate.
2023-03-03HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-23.
2023-03-03HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1050) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading.
2023-02-28HouseThe committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Lowen, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tam; 2 Noes: Representative(s) Amato, Pierick; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Gates.
2023-02-24HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-28-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Marten excused (1).
2023-02-17HouseReported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 726) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2023-02-15HouseThe committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Mizuno, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia.
2023-02-13HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-15-23 11:30AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-02-10HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-23.
2023-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 02-10-23 10:00AM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-01-25HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 1
2023-01-20HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2023-01-19HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB378 (Carry Over) 2023-04-21 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 830).
SB983 (Same As) 2023-01-27 - Referred to HHS, CPN.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback