HI HB378 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB378
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows the low-income housing tax credit to be allocated among the partners or members of the taxpayer earning the credit in any manner by the parties. Extends increases made to the low-income housing tax credit from 12/31/21 to 12/31/27.
Title
Relating To Low-income Housing Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB378 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB659 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 630).
SB659 (Same As) 2021-04-23 - Received notice of discharge of all conferees (Hse. Com. No. 630).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=378&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB378_.HTM |