HI HB378 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB378
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an investigator to issue a citation to any person determined to be acting in the capacity of or engaging in the business of a contractor within the State without having a required license. Clarifies that DCCA may pursue available civil remedies such as court-ordered injunctions and enhanced fines. (HB378 HD1)
Title
Relating To Licensing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 695) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-14-17 10:00AM in conference room 309. |
2017-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2017-02-06 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-09-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to LAB, JUD, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1130 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB378 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).
HB378 (Carry Over) 2017-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2).