HI HB374 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB374

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends Act 72, Session Laws of Hawaii 2020, to require that the school facilities agency complies with the Hawaii Public Procurement Code. Authorizes the school facilities agency to have additional powers and duties. Specifies additional uses for the school facilities special fund. Provides the executive director of the school facilities agency with authority relating to capital improvement projects for the school facilities agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To A School Facilities Agency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB466 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB374 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback