HI HB374 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB374
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends Act 72, Session Laws of Hawaii 2020, to require that the school facilities agency complies with the Hawaii Public Procurement Code. Authorizes the school facilities agency to have additional powers and duties. Specifies additional uses for the school facilities special fund. Provides the executive director of the school facilities agency with authority relating to capital improvement projects for the school facilities agency.
Title
Relating To A School Facilities Agency.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB374 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 1
SB466 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB466 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=374&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB374_.HTM |