HI HB374 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 084, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - Act 084, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the auditor to conduct a study on the effects of regulation of dental assistants in the State via the certification requirements for dental assistants offered by Kapiolani community college. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Dental Assistants.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | Act 084, 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185). |
2017-07-07 | House | Act 084, on 07/05/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1185). |
2017-05-01 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 638). |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, McDermott, Quinlan, Thielen, Tokioka excused (6). |
2017-04-28 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 633). |
2017-04-27 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-17. |
2017-04-26 | House | The House Conference Managers recommend to agree to the Senate Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Ohno, Takumi, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-17 4:00PM in conference room 016. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 622). |
2017-04-24 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Ohno, Takumi, Kobayashi Co-Chairs; Tupola. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Nishihara. |
2017-04-17 | House | Re-referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 45 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 561) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1504) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Inouye. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee on WAM has added the measure to decision making scheduled on 04-03-17 1:35PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1005) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 252). |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 980) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama. |
2017-02-24 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:55PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-23 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-01-17. |
2017-02-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-23-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with Representative(s) Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Holt, Souki excused (3). |
2017-02-16 | House | Reported from HLT/IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 469) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Choy, Onishi, Tokioka, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ito, Ward. |
2017-02-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro, Todd; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Tupola; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Har. |
2017-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/IAC on Tuesday, 02-14-17 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT/IAC, CPC, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |