HI HB366 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB366
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts candidates who are deemed elected, running unopposed, or unsuccessful after a primary or special primary election from the prohibition on donating excess campaign funds for charitable or scholarship purposes before the general election date. (HB366 HD1)
Title
Relating To Campaign Finance.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4). |
2019-02-12 | House | Deferred one day 02-13-19. |
2019-02-12 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 317) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Lowen, McKelvey, Morikawa, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Say, Thielen. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-04-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-02-01 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-04-19. |
2019-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-01-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB366 (Carry Over) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).
SB197 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Act 107, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209).
SB197 (Same As) 2019-06-25 - Act 107, 06/21/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1209).