HI HB365 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB365
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the exemption of the Hawaii Public Housing Authority from certain administrative supervision by its board of directors regarding personnel matters. Effective 7/1/2075. (SD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Public Housing Authority.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1440) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Moriwaki, L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-19-19 1:20PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 37). |
2019-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 847), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Todd. |
2019-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-21-19 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Mizuno, Nakamura, Ward excused (5). |
2019-02-13 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 356) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-02-05 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Aquino, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 02-05-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB365 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB326 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.
SB326 (Same As) 2019-01-29 - The committee on HOU deferred the measure.