HI HB364 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB364
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Re-referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-02 - Re-referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 4
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes counties to levy a county surcharge on transient accommodations tax in their respective counties pursuant to certain conditions. Sunsets on 12/31/2036.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-02 | House | Re-referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB364 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Re-referred to LAT, FIN, referral sheet 4
SB642 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to PSM/EET, WAM.
SB642 (Same As) 2021-01-27 - Referred to PSM/EET, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=364&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/HB364_.HTM |