HI HB36 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB36

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriates funds for the Department of Human Services to purchase, staff, and operate two mobile clinics to serve the homeless persons residing in ohana zones. (HB36 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Human Services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-14 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-14HouseThe committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-02-12HouseBill re-scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 02-14-19 9:00AM in conference room 329.
2019-02-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Thursday, 02-14-19 8:30AM in House conference room 312.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 2
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-16HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB526 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB36 (Carry Over) 2019-02-15 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback