HI HB356 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-18 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that for purposes of the Freedom of Information Law, there is no significant privacy interest in government records containing information of a licensee's record relating to requisite experience, trade examination results, and bonding. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB356 HD1)
Title
Government Records; Significant Privacy Interest
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 501) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-02-10 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Tokioka. | |
2011-02-08 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by ERB on Thursday, 02-10-11 8:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to ERB, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |