HI HB355 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB355
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to TRN/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-referred to TRN/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reduces the vehicle registration fee and maintains allocation of the fee to the state highway fund and emergency medical services special fund.
Title
Relating To Vehicle Registration Fee Reduction.
Sponsors
Rep. Beth Fukumoto Chang [R] | Rep. Lauren Matsumoto [R] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
Rep. Andria Tupola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | House | Re-referred to TRN/HHS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to TRN/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB355 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to TRN/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=355&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB355_.HTM |