HI HB35 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB35
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes expenditures from the mental health and substance abuse special fund to be used for capital improvement projects. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Mental Health.
Sponsors
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Bertrand Kobayashi [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-21 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3410) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Nishihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-10-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 121). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 832-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Wildberger, McDermott. |
2020-02-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-20 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-12 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 313-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Mizuno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Kong, Matsumoto. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 53-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2020-01-27 | House | Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-30-20 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-17 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-16 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB35 (Carry Over) 2019-01-31 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.