HI HB35 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-31 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Restores the categories of "gravely disabled" and "obviously ill" to the criteria for involuntary hospitalization that were deleted by Act 221, SLH 2013. Increases the maximum period of emergency hospitalization from 48 hours to 72 hours.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Mental Health.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-31HouseThe committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2019-01-28HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 01-31-19 9:30AM in House conference room 329.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2
2019-01-17HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-16HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback