HI HB347 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB347
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-28 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies Hawaii's employment security law for independent contractors by requiring the consideration of twenty factors by the Department of Labor Industrial Relations when determining whether an individual is considered an independent contractor. Requires the Director of Labor and Industrial Relations to report to the Legislature prior to the Regular Session of 2018 regarding guidelines developed by the unemployment insurance coverage committee. Requires an annual report to the Legislature regarding covered employment determinations. Takes effect 1/7/2059. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Employment Security.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-28 | Senate | The conference committee deferred the measure. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-17 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-26 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-21 | House | Received notice of change in Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 691). |
2017-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 1:45PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Senate Conferees Added: Senator Tokuda added as Co-Chair. |
2017-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-20-17 1:45PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, CPH/WAM. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Baker Co-Chair; Gabbard. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586). |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Takumi, Holt Co-Chairs; Nakashima, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2017-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 560) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Taniguchi). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1545) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPH. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 936) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPH. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) K. Rhoads ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDL, CPH. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 89). |
2017-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Nakamura, Quinlan voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ichiyama, McDermott excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 966), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Choy, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, LoPresti; 4 Noes: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Lowen, Tupola. |
2017-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-01-17 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Tokioka excused (2). |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 705) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd, Yamane, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-17 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2017-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-17. |
2017-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-07-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-02-02 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing excused (1). |
2017-02-02 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 11) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-01-31 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 01-31-17 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB347 (Carry Over) 2017-04-28 - The conference committee deferred the measure.
SB345 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
SB345 (Same As) 2017-02-10 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.