HI HB344 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB344

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that the Board of Land and Natural Resources and Commission on Water Resource Management shall not conduct contested case hearings, and counties shall not conduct contested case hearings regarding disputes over land use, but that decisions and disputes may be contested and adjudicated in circuit court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Government.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-02 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-10HouseThe committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-10-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-05HousePassed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, Perruso, Wildberger voting no (3) and Representative(s) Matayoshi excused (1).
2021-02-05HouseReported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-02HouseThe committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, McDermott.
2021-01-29HouseBill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 02-02-21 9:00AM in House conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to WAL, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

HB344 (Carry Over) 2021-02-10 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback