HI HB344 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-31 - The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes DPS to adopt rules for submitting eligible claims for inmate health care to medicaid. Authorizes DPS to implement automated systems for billing, payment, and recovery of overpayments.
Title
Corrections; Inmate Medical Services; Medicaid
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on PBS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 01-31-13 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to PBS, HUS, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=344&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HB344_.HTM |