HI HB340 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB340
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Referred to JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to the Constitution of the State of Hawaii to require the judicial selection commission to be guided by principles of merit in the selection of judicial nominations and the retention of judges and justices.
Title
Proposing An Amendment To The Constitution Of The State Of Hawaii To Require The Judicial Selection Commission To Be Guided By Principles Of Merit In The Selection Of Judicial Nominations And The Retention Of Judges And Justices.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 117). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 797), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ohno excused (1). |
2021-02-11 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 185), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-04 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2021-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-04-21 2:00PM in House conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB340 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to JDC/WAM.