HI HB339 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous HB339

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Makes decisions of the family court appealable to the supreme court instead of the intermediate court of appeals. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Family Court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-04 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-09SenateReferred to JDC.
2021-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 116).
2021-03-05HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ganaden, Har, Ward voting no (3) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2021-03-05HouseReported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 827), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2021-03-04HouseThe committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Takumi, Tokioka.
2021-03-03HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 03-04-21 2:15PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-18HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Gates excused (1).
2021-02-18HouseReported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 414) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA.
2021-02-11HouseThe committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti.
2021-02-08HouseBill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-11-21 9:30AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference.
2021-01-27HouseReferred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 1
2021-01-25HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2021-01-22HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB632 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB339 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback