HI HB339 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB339

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - The hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the state tax credit for research activities to one and one-quarter times the allowable federal tax credit. Repeals December 31, 2019 sunset. (HB339 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-08 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateThe hearing on this measure has been cancelled until further notice.
2020-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-20 10:35AM in conference room 211.
2019-12-01 Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
2019-03-05SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-03-05SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-03-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 163).
2019-03-01HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-03-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1103), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-26HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto.
2019-02-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-26-19 1:30PM in House conference room 308.
2019-02-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Nakamura, Quinlan, Thielen excused (5).
2019-02-15HouseReported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 655) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN.
2019-02-08HouseThe committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto.
2019-02-06HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-08-19 10:00AM in conference room 309.
2019-02-06HouseThe committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-08-19.
2019-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Wednesday, 02-06-19 11:00AM in House conference room 309.
2019-01-22HouseReferred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 3
2019-01-22HouseIntroduced and Pass First Reading.
2019-01-18HousePending introduction.

Same As/Similar To

SB965 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
HB339 (Carry Over) 2019-03-05 - Referred to WAM.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback