HI HB337 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB337
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the language and meaning of any proposed constitutional amendment and ratification question to be simple, concise, and direct to the extent practicable. Allows the presiding officers of the legislature to request a written opinion of the supreme court regarding the legality of a proposed amendment to the Hawaii State Constitution and the corresponding constitutional ratification question. Requires the court to provide a written opinion within 48 hours of receipt of the request. Requires, for any written opinion by the court that invalidates a constitutional ratification question, a detailed and specific explanation of the reasons for this opinion. Prohibits any appeal of a written opinion. Effective 7/1/3021. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Constitutional Amendments.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-26 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to JDC/WAM. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 115). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 796), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-26 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2021-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-26-21 11:00AM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 560) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-02-17 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, McKelvey, Nakamura, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Takumi. |
2021-02-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-17-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB640 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
HB337 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to JDC/WAM.
HB337 (Carry Over) 2021-03-09 - Referred to JDC/WAM.