HI HB337 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates registration requirements and qualifications for athletic trainers in this State; provides exemptions; prescribes penalties. Effective July 1, 2020. (HB337 D1)
Title
Athletic Trainers; Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Referred to CPN, WAM. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-03-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 89). | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-03-04 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 821), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-02 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-02-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-02-11 12:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, McKelvey excused (3). | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Reported from CPC/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 541) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Carroll, Ito, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro. | |
2011-02-07 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Keith-Agaran, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Ching, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Carroll, Ito, McKelvey, Morita, B. Oshiro. | |
2011-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC/JUD on Monday, 02-07-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to CPC/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB155 (Same As) 2012-07-06 - (S) Act 198, 7/3/2012 (Gov. Msg. No. 1301).