HI HB333 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB333
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals payroll day for public officers and employees by requiring them to be paid pursuant to a predicted payroll schedule, rather than an after-the-fact payroll schedule. Provides that the predicted payroll schedule shall be subject to negotiation. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Public Employee Compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1). |
2023-02-13 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 312) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2023-02-07 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-07-23 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-20 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1048 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
HB333 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1).
HB333 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=333&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB333_HD1_.HTM |