HI HB33 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Act 049, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1149).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Act 049, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1149).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes issuance of general obligation bonds. Makes findings required by Article VII, Section 13, of the Hawaii State Constitution to declare that the issuance of authorized bonds will not cause the debt limit to be exceeded. (CD1)
Title
Relating To State Bonds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Act 049, 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1149). |
2023-06-01 | House | Act 049, on 06/01/2023 (Gov. Msg. No. 1149). |
2023-05-04 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2023-05-04 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 996). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 901). |
2023-05-04 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Lowen, Martinez excused (2). |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1) Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2023-05-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 191). |
2023-05-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 05-04-23. |
2023-05-02 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 191) as amended in (CD 1). |
2023-04-27 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-27 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Nishimoto, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-26 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-27-23 4:00PM in conference room 309. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 801). |
2023-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamashita Chair; Nishimoto, Alcos. |
2023-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 889). |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 800). |
2023-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2023-04-11 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 712) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Keohokalole). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-23. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1779) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 5 Excused: Senator(s) Aquino, Kidani, Kim, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-23 12:30PM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 239). |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Matayoshi excused (2). |
2023-03-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 937) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2023-02-17 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-17-23 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-01-25 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2023-01-12 | House | Prefiled. |